EP1594375 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TEMPERING FROZEN FOODSTUFFS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freezing Machines, Inc. 891 Two Rivers Drive Dakota Dunes, SD 57049 / US | [2005/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTH, Eldon 891 Two Rivers Drive Dakota Dunes, SD 57049 / US | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Eder, Thomas Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Eder, Thomas Eder & Schieschke, Patentanwälte, Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03814341.8 | 23.12.2003 | [2005/46] | WO2003US41040 | Priority number, date | US20020328591 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: US 328591 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004057978 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1594375 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23P1/00, H05B6/00 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
A23L3/365 (EP,US);
A23B4/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TEMPERIEREN EINGEFRORENER LEBENSMITTEL | [2005/46] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TEMPERING FROZEN FOODSTUFFS | [2005/46] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DESTINES A DECONGELER DES ALIMENTS | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/02] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.08.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | 25.08.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.08.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   25.08.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4188467 (COLLINS VERNON K [US], et al) [X] 18,19,21 * column 1, lines 22-24 * * column 4, lines 48-56 * * column 5, lines 32-62 *[Y] 8-10,20,22; | [Y]GB2064306 (IOZZELLI A) [Y] 4-7,9,10,14,20 * page 1, lines 5-22,32-37,86-97 * * figure 3 *; | [XY]GB2098040 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,3,11 * page 1, column 1, lines 6-24 * * page 2, column 1, lines 2-5 * [Y] 8,16,22; | [Y]EP0228645 (PERRINE PAUL M) [Y] 4-7,9,10,14 * column 2, lines 15-35 * * column 4, lines 18-49 *; | [XY]EP0338615 (STORK DUKE BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,11,12,15 * column 2, lines 32-36 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 11 * * column 5, lines 36-41 * [Y] 4-10,14,16 | International search | [X]US4188467 (COLLINS VERNON K [US], et al); | [A]US5885637 (ROTH ELDON [US], et al) |