EP1679964 - COMPOSTIONS AND PROCESSES USING SIRNA AMPHIPATHIC COMPOUNDS AND POLYCATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirus Bio LLC 545 Science Drive, Suite A Madison, WI 53711 / US | [2010/38] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Mirus Bio Corporation 505 S. Rosa Rd. Madison, WI 53719 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, David, L. 2629 Union Street Madison, WI 53704 / US | 02 /
HAGSTROM, James, E. 4700 Bergamot Way Middleton, WI 53562 / US | 03 /
HERWEIJER, Hans W1602 Mortensen Road Brooklyn, WI 53521 / US | 04 /
MONAHAN, Sean, D. P.O. Box 267, 10 W Hudson Street Mazomanie, WI 53560 / US | 05 /
WOLF, Jon, A. 1122 University Bay Drive Madison, WI 53705 / US | 06 /
SLATTUM, Paul, M. 2838 East Westerling Way Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121 / US | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/29] | 01 /
LEWIS, David, L. 2629 Union Street Madison, WI 53704 / US | ||
02 /
HAGSTROM, James, E. 4700 Bergamot Way Middleton, WI 53562 / US | |||
03 /
HERWEIJER, Hans 6245 Sandsnes Lane Madison, WI 53719 / US | |||
04 /
MONAHAN, Sean, D. 5610 Tolman Terrace Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
05 /
WOLF, Jon, A. 1122 University Bay Drive Madison, WI 53705 / US | |||
06 /
SLATTUM, Paul, M. 4306 Keting Terrace Madison, WI 53711 / US | Representative(s) | van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 03814415.0 | 11.08.2003 | [2006/29] | WO2003US25121 | Priority number, date | US20030621760 | 17.07.2003 Original published format: US 621760 | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005017098 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1679964 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/58 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/74 (EP,US);
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2320/32 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/58, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/74, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2006/29] | A01N43/04, A61K31/70, C12N5/00, C12N15/88 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT BZW. VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON SIRNA-AMPHIPATHISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN UND POLYKATIONEN | [2006/29] | English: | COMPOSTIONS AND PROCESSES USING SIRNA AMPHIPATHIC COMPOUNDS AND POLYCATIONS | [2006/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES UTILISANT UN ARNSI, DES COMPOSES AMPHIPATHIQUES ET DES POLYCATIONS | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 01.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03040375 (MIRUS CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 4; examples 1,2 *; | [X]US2003125281 (LEWIS DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-9* pages 2-20 * | International search | [X]US2003044983 (HERWEIJER HANS [US], et al); | [X]WO0210177 (GMP COMPANIES INC [US]) |