EP1581995 - CONTROLLABLE RF BROADBAND AMPLIFIER WITH A CONSTANT INPUT IMPEDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEMMANN, Heinrich Danziger Str. 17 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
IPEK, Mehmet 7601 Churchill Way 426 Dallas, TX 75251 / US | 03 /
ROTH, Sabine Obere Mühlenstr. 56 78087 Mönchweiler / DE | [2007/01] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
SCHEMMANN, Heinrich Danziger Str. 17 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
02 /
IPEK, Mehmet Friedrichstr. 10/1 78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | |||
03 /
ROTH, Sabine Obere Mühlenstr. 56 78087 Mönchweiler / DE | Representative(s) | Lindemann, Robert, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Lindemann, Robert, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Lindemann, Robert, et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2005/40] | Rossmanith, Manfred Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 03815054.6 | 05.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003EP13741 | Priority number, date | DE2003100431 | 09.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300431 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004064250 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581995 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1581995 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/72, H03G1/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H03F3/72 (EP,KR,US);
H03F1/56 (KR);
H03F3/19 (KR);
H03G1/0088 (EP,US);
H03F2203/7203 (EP,US);
H03F2203/7206 (EP,US);
H03F2203/7227 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, TR [2006/17] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REGELBARER HF-BREITBANDVERSTÄRKER MIT KONSTANTER EINGANGSIMPEDANZ | [2011/47] | English: | CONTROLLABLE RF BROADBAND AMPLIFIER WITH A CONSTANT INPUT IMPEDANCE | [2005/40] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR A LARGE BANDE RF REGLABLE AYANT UNE IMPEDANCE D'ENTREE CONSTANTE | [2005/40] |
Former [2005/40] | REGELBARER HF-BREITBANDVERSTûRKER MIT KONSTANTER EINGANGSIMPEDANZ | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 08.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.05.2012 | [2013/46] | Cited in | International search | [X]US5530404 (DEBROUX JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-9,11-14 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 62; figure 2 *; | [A]US5977828 (HU XIAOYUN [CA], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 38; figure 5 * |