EP1585888 - Turbocharger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/42] | SEALING MEANS FOR A LUBRICATION SYSTEM IN A TURBOCHARGER | ||
[2018/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIEU, Philippe, @c/o Honeywell Garrett B.P. 19 - Z.I. Route d'Oncourt 88150 Thaon-les-Vosges / FR | 02 /
FIGURA, Giorgio, @c/o Honeywell Garrett B.P. 19 - Z.I. Route d'Oncourt 88150 Thaon-les-Vosges / FR | 03 /
GENIN, Emeric, @c/o Honeywell Garrett B.P. 19 - Z.I. Route d'Oncourt 88150 Thaon-les-Vosges / FR | 04 /
LAVEZ, Alexis, @c/o Honeywell Garrett B.P. 19 - Z.I. Route d'Oncourt 88150 Thaon-les-Vosges / FR | [2018/39] |
Former [2005/42] | 01 /
MATHIEU, Philippe, c/o Honeywell Garrett B.P. 19 - Z.I. Route d'Oncourt 88150 Thaon-les-Vosges / FR | ||
02 /
FIGURA, Giorgio, c/o Honeywell Garrett B.P. 19 - Z.I. Route d'Oncourt 88150 Thaon-les-Vosges / FR | |||
03 /
GENIN, Emeric, c/o Honeywell Garrett B.P. 19 - Z.I. Route d'Oncourt 88150 Thaon-les-Vosges / FR | |||
04 /
LAVEZ, Alexis, c/o Honeywell Garrett B.P. 19 - Z.I. Route d'Oncourt 88150 Thaon-les-Vosges / FR | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/39] |
Former [2005/42] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03815122.1 | 10.01.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003IB00042 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004063535 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585888 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585888 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F02B37/00, F02B37/007, F02B37/18, F02B39/14, F02C3/13, F02B37/12, F01D25/18, F04D29/10, F02B37/16 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
F01D25/186 (EP);
F01D11/00 (EP);
F01D25/183 (EP);
F02B37/002 (EP);
F02B37/007 (EP);
F02B37/16 (EP);
F02B37/162 (EP);
F02B37/18 (EP);
F02B39/14 (EP);
F02C3/13 (EP);
F04D29/104 (EP);
F05D2220/40 (EP);
F05D2240/40 (EP);
F05D2260/60 (EP);
F05D2260/6022 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/42] | F01D25/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/39] |
Former [2006/18] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turbolader | [2018/12] | English: | Turbocharger | [2018/12] | French: | Turbocompresseur | [2018/12] |
Former [2005/42] | DICHTUNGSMITTEL FÜR EIN SCHMIERSYSTEM IN EINEM TURBOLADER | ||
Former [2005/42] | SEALING MEANS FOR A LUBRICATION SYSTEM IN A TURBOCHARGER | ||
Former [2005/42] | TURBOCOMPRESSEUR ET SYSTEME DE SURALIMENTATION A PLUSIEURS TURBOCOMPRESSEURS | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP07116473.5 / EP1860299 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Request for further processing for: | 01.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3825311 (MURRAY B) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * column A; figure - * * column 1, line 63 - column 1, line 67 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 9 *; | [X]US4196910 (AIZU SHOICHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * figures 5-7 * * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 37 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 13 *; | [X]JPS5893932 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2,4,5,8* column A *; | [Y]US4752193 (HOERLER HANSULRICH [CH]) [Y] 9,10 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 45 - column 2, line 53 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 34 - column 4, line 68 *; | [X]DE3817617 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * column W *; | [XY]EP0357246 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column A; figures 3-6 * * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 20 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 19 * [Y] 9,10; | [X]US5890881 (ADEFF GEORGE A [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * column A; figure - * * column 1, line 7 - column 1, line 13 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 52 *; | [X]EP1273765 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * column A; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * |