EP1584073 - ELECTRONIC LOCKING DEVICE AND SAFETY KEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KESO AG Untere Schwandenstrasse 22 8805 Richterswil / CH | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Ernst Studenbühlstrasse 45 CH-8832 Wollerau / CH | 02 /
VONLANTHEN, Bruno Untere Leimenstrasse 6 CH-8718 Schänis / CH | 03 /
SPÄNI, Urs Etzelstrasse 48 CH-8834 Schindellegi / CH | 04 /
OECHSLIN, Urs Unterdorfstrasse 14 CH-8124 Maur / CH | 05 /
BEELER, Vinzenz Galtschinisweg 16 CH-7324 Vilters / CH | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03815349.0 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/41] | WO2003CH00818 | Priority number, date | CH20030006703 | 17.01.2003 Original published format: CH 67032003 | [2005/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004066220 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1584073 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584073 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
G07C9/00944 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00341 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00507 (EP,US);
G07C2209/61 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7079 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK [2005/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE SCHLIESSEINRICHTUNG UND SICHERHEITSSCHLUESSEL | [2007/26] | English: | ELECTRONIC LOCKING DEVICE AND SAFETY KEY | [2005/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE ELECTRONIQUE ET CLE DE SURETE | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/41] | ELEKTRONISCHE SCHLIESSEINRICHTUNG UND SICHERHEITSSCHL SSEL | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | RO | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | LU | 15.12.2007 | IE | 17.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | [2009/40] |
Former [2009/35] | CY | 14.11.2007 | |
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 14.11.2007 | |
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | SI | 14.11.2007 | |
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 14.11.2007 | |
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | BG | 14.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2294720 (JANSON NIGEL [GB]) [A] 1-16 * abstract ** page 3, lines 12-21 *; | [Y]EP0838568 (KESO SALZBURG GMBH [AT]) [Y] 2-10,12-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 1 *; | [X]DE19939063 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [XY]WO02075669 (BURG WAECHTER KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 13 * [Y] 2-10,12-16 |