EP1581750 - FIXING DEVICE FOR THE ASSEMBLY OF ELEMENTS IN A RESTRICTED SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panhard Général Défense 18 Ave d'Ivry 75013 Paris / FR | [2008/01] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Societe Nouvelle des Automobiles Auverland (S.N.A.A.) Le Pralong, Boite Postale 12 42260 Saint Germain Laval / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONS, Christian 219, rue de la Croix Nivert F-75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
DUCLOS, Jean-Christophe Le Ribot F- 42130 Arthun / FR | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Pichat, Thierry, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Pichat, Thierry, et al Novagraaf Technologies, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03815699.8 | 24.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003FR03899 | Priority number, date | FR20030000149 | 08.01.2003 Original published format: FR 0300149 | [2005/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070217 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581750 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1581750 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04, F16B21/09, F16B39/10 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
F16B5/0685 (EP,US);
F16B21/09 (EP,US);
F16B37/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR MONTAGE VON ELEMENTEN IN EINEM EINGESCHRÄNKTEN RAUM | [2005/40] | English: | FIXING DEVICE FOR THE ASSEMBLY OF ELEMENTS IN A RESTRICTED SPACE | [2005/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION POUR LE MONTAGE D ELEMENTS DANS UN ESPACE RESTREINT | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2006 | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2007 | 31.12.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | IE | 03.11.2010 | IT | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | LU | 24.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GB | 03.02.2011 | ES | 14.02.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | HU | 04.05.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
LU | 24.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GB | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
HU | 04.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GB | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
HU | 04.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GB | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GB | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1732993 (SPIRO WALTER J) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3450427 (FISCHER ARTUR) [A] 1* figure - *; | [X]DE4444413 (FRICKER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1039154 (WALRAVEN J VAN BV [NL]) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [XY]DE20012600U (ANCRA JUNGFALK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * page 5 - page 6; figure - * [Y] 5 | by applicant | US4850063 |