EP1592916 - SAMPLING DEVICE AND SAMPLING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Pharma Systems AG Hauptstrasse 145 4416 Bubendorf / CH | [2010/21] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Aeromatic-Fielder AG 145, Hauptstrasse 4416 Bubendorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOFFEL, Jean-Pierre 16, rue des Saules F-68740 Blodelsheim / FR | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Carlsson, Eva Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Carlsson, Eva Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2005/45] | Olsen, Lau Lund Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 03815843.2 | 11.02.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003IB00447 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004072543 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592916 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592916 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F17D3/10, G01N1/20, F16L37/00, F16K27/02 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
F17D3/10 (EP,US);
G01N2001/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENAHMEVORRICHTUNG UND PROBENAHMEVERFAHREN | [2005/45] | English: | SAMPLING DEVICE AND SAMPLING METHOD | [2005/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ECHANTILLONNAGE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 01.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | BE | 14.07.2010 | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | IT | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | ES | 25.10.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | IE | 11.02.2011 | LU | 11.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
TR | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
IE | 11.02.2011 | ||
LU | 11.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
IE | 11.02.2011 | ||
LU | 11.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
IE | 11.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
NL | 14.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4150575 (MAGORIEN VINCENT G [US]) [X] 1-3,16,18 * the whole document *; | [A]US4484482 (FOURNIER PAUL J E [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XA]US4689306 (REDIKULTSEV JURY V [SU], et al) [X] 1,3,16,18 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 42; figure - * [A] 4-15,17,19; | [X]US4699356 (HARGROVE BARRY C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,16 * the whole document * |