EP1592526 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUS MANUFACTURING OF CURVED INSULATING PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METECNO S.p.A. Via Incisa, 24 14040 Cortiglione (AT) / IT | [2008/04] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states METECNO S.p.A. Via per Cassino, 19 20067 Tribiano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORANDI, Maurizio Via Raffaello Lambruschini, 12 I-10143 Torino / IT | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Ferroni, Filippo, et al Metroconsult S.r.l. Foro Buonaparte, 51 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Ferroni, Filippo, et al Vicolo Giardino, 3 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/45] | Ferroni, Filippo, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Turati 32 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03815851.5 | 13.02.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003IT00074 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071691 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592526 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592526 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B21D47/04, B29C44/30, E04D3/35 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
E04B7/08 (EP);
B21D47/04 (EP);
B29C33/308 (EP);
B29C44/326 (EP);
E04D3/351 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON GEKRÜMMTEN ISOLIERPLATTEN | [2007/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUS MANUFACTURING OF CURVED INSULATING PANELS | [2005/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A LA FABRICATION EN CONTINU DE PANNEAUX ISOLANTS INCURVES | [2005/45] |
Former [2005/45] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VONGEKRÜMMTEN ISOLIERPLATTEN | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | Translation filed | 11.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.10.2007 | DK | 03.10.2007 | FI | 03.10.2007 | SE | 03.01.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | LU | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | HU | 14.02.2008 | SI | 14.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | [2015/21] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
LU | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
HU | 14.02.2008 | ||
SI | 14.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
HU | 14.02.2008 | ||
SI | 14.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 03.10.2007 | |
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
HU | 14.02.2008 | ||
SI | 14.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
HU | 14.02.2008 | ||
SI | 14.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
HU | 14.02.2008 | ||
SI | 14.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 03.10.2007 | |
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | SE | 03.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3643306 (MASSAGLI DANIEL, et al) [A] 1,7 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US3734668 (PORTER L) [A] 7* column 9, line 27 - column 10, line 8; figures 1,14-17 *; | [A]US4147582 (BROLLO GIUSEPPE) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [AD]IT1181454 (METECNO SPA [IT]) [AD] 1,7 * figure - * |