EP1594328 - RADIO COMMUNICATION MOBILE STATION APPARATUS AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/45] | RECEIVING APPARATUS AND RECEIVING METHOD | ||
[2008/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAKI, Toshiaki c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd. IPROC Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Hidetoshi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IPROC Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
HIRAKI, Toshiaki 6-2-905, Hikari no Oka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0847 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Hidetoshi 6-2-803, Hikari no Oka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0847 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03815857.2 | 30.07.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003JP09625 | Priority number, date | JP20030034201 | 12.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003034201 | [2005/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004073346 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594328 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594328 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/0083 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/1829 (BR);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04L1/1812 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (EP,BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/45] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FUNKKOMMUNIKATION | [2008/18] | English: | RADIO COMMUNICATION MOBILE STATION APPARATUS AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2008/18] | French: | STATION MOBILE DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION ET PROCEDE DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/45] | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2005/45] | RECEIVING APPARATUS AND RECEIVING METHOD | ||
Former [2005/45] | RECEPTEUR ET METHODE DE RECEPTION | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2005 | Translation filed | 11.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08017818.9 / EP2034773 | EP17157067.4 / EP3203773 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2008 | BE | 05.11.2008 | CY | 05.11.2008 | CZ | 05.11.2008 | DK | 05.11.2008 | EE | 05.11.2008 | NL | 05.11.2008 | RO | 05.11.2008 | SI | 05.11.2008 | SK | 05.11.2008 | TR | 05.11.2008 | BG | 05.02.2009 | GR | 06.02.2009 | ES | 16.02.2009 | PT | 06.04.2009 | HU | 06.05.2009 | IE | 30.07.2009 | LU | 30.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 30.07.2009 | ||
LU | 30.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
IE | 30.07.2009 | ||
LU | 30.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
IE | 30.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
IE | 30.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
BE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 16.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6351638 (ROBINSON WILLIAM [GB]) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 55 - line 57 * * column 4, line 47 - line 65 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002155829 (PROCTOR JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 2,5,6,11,12 * page 2, column R, paragraph 22 ** figures 3a,3b,4a,4b,5 *; | [A] - MOULY M ET AL, "SIGNALLING TRANSFER", GSM SYSTEM FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS, LASSAY-LES-CHATEAUX, EUROPE MEDIA, FR, (1993), pages 260 - 306, XP000860005 [A] 1,8 * page 272, paragraph 5.2.3 - page 277 * | International search | [A]JPH05130082 (NEC CORP); | [X]JP2000069110 (DDI CORP); | [Y]JP2002281003 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |