EP1601751 - ORGANOSULFUR OXIDATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lyondell Chemical Technology, L.P. Two Greenville Crossing 4001 Kennett Pike Suite 238 Greenville, DE 19807 / US | [2006/48] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Lyondell Chemical Technology, L.P. Two Greenville Crossing 4001 Kennett Pike Suite 238 Greenville, DE 19807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARAS, Lawrence, J. 1010 Rock Creek Road West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 02 /
HAN, Yuan-Zhang 235 Oxford Road West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 03 /
LEYSHON, David, W. 408 Trio Lane West Chester, PA 19382 / US | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Nederlof, Etienne C. Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Postbus 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Nederlof, Etienne C. Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V., Postbus 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03816405.9 | 19.12.2003 | [2005/49] | WO2003US41551 | Priority number, date | US20030387908 | 13.03.2003 Original published format: US 387908 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004083346 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601751 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601751 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C10G53/14 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
C10G53/14 (EP,KR,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORGANOSCHWEFELOXIDATIONSVERFAHREN | [2005/49] | English: | ORGANOSULFUR OXIDATION PROCESS | [2005/49] | French: | PROCEDE D'OXYDATION D'ORGANOSOUFRE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 17.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2006 | CH | 29.11.2006 | CY | 29.11.2006 | CZ | 29.11.2006 | EE | 29.11.2006 | FI | 29.11.2006 | LI | 29.11.2006 | RO | 29.11.2006 | SI | 29.11.2006 | SK | 29.11.2006 | TR | 29.11.2006 | IE | 19.12.2006 | LU | 19.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | SE | 28.02.2007 | GR | 01.03.2007 | PT | 30.04.2007 | HU | 30.05.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
TR | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 19.12.2006 | ||
LU | 19.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
HU | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 19.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
HU | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 19.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 19.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
IE | 19.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
SI | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
RO | 29.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
CH | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
LI | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3816301 (SORGENTI H) [DA] 1,12 * claims 1,9 *; | [A]GB2030592 (MOBIL OIL CORP) [A] 1-4* claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6197163 (HAELSIG CLAUS-PETER THOMAS [GB]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]WO0132809 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,13-15,21 * claims 30,36,37,39 * * page 7, line 13 - line 15 * * page 12, line 7 - line 10 * * page 14, line 14 - line 18 *; | [A]WO0148119 (ELF ANTAR FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1,12-14 * claims 1,2,7,9,10,15 * |