EP1612040 - INORGANIC-ORGANIC HYBRID-FILM-COATED STAINLESS STEEL FOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/01] | STAINLESS-STEEL FOILS WITH INORGANIC/ORGANIC HYBRID FILM COATING | ||
[2018/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumikin Materials Co., Ltd. 7-16-3, Ginza Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2018/41] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAKAMI, Keiko, @c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Dev. Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Noriko, @c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Dev. Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | 03 /
HAMADA, Takeshi, @c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Dev. Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | 04 /
KUBO, Yuji, @c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Dev. Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | [2018/43] |
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
KAWAKAMI, Keiko, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Dev. Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMADA, Noriko, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Dev. Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | |||
03 /
HAMADA, Takeshi, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Dev. Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | |||
04 /
KUBO, Yuji, c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION Technical Dev. Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/43] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03816458.8 | 07.08.2003 | [2006/01] | WO2003JP10087 | Priority number, date | JP20030087950 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003087950 | [2006/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004085145 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612040 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612040 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, C23C26/00, C23C18/12, C23C30/00 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
C23C18/1254 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (KR);
C23C26/00 (EP,US);
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | B32B15/08, C23C26/00, C23C18/12 | ||
Former IPC [2006/01] | B32B15/08, C23C26/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MIT EINEM ANORGANISCH-ORGANISCHEN HYBRIDFILM BESCHICHTE EDELSTAHFOLIE | [2018/43] | English: | INORGANIC-ORGANIC HYBRID-FILM-COATED STAINLESS STEEL FOIL | [2018/43] | French: | FEUILLE D'ACIER INOXYDABLE REVÊTUE D'UN FILM HYBRIDE INORGANIQUE-ORGANIQUE | [2018/43] |
Former [2006/01] | EDELSTAHLFOLIEN MIT ANORGANISCHER/ORGANISCHER HYBRIDBESCHICHTUNG | ||
Former [2006/01] | STAINLESS-STEEL FOILS WITH INORGANIC/ORGANIC HYBRID FILM COATING | ||
Former [2006/01] | FEUILLES EN ACIER INOXYDABLE POURVUES D'UN REVETEMENT DE FILM HYBRIDE INORGANIQUE/ORGANIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2005 | Translation filed | 27.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2003 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001041766 (WIELSTRA YTSEN [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,13-17* paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059]; example 8 * | International search | [A]JPH0977509 (YAMAMURA GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2002038093 (FUJI XEROX SUZUKA, et al) |