EP1620069 - WARMING AND NONIRRITATING LUBRICANT FUNGICIDE COMPOSITIONS IN THE FORM OF A GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/05] | WARNING AND NONIRRITATING LUBRICANT FUNGICIDE COMPOSITIONS IN THE FORM OF A GEL | ||
[2007/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states McNEIL-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states McNEIL-PPC, INC. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMAD, Nawaz 26 Joseph Court Monmouth Junction, NJ 8852 / US | 02 /
LAMB, Christopher Scott 4856 Green Heather Court Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 03 /
LONARDO, Emilia Casilio 2 Rutledge Court Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | Groening, Hans Wilhelm BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03816835.7 | 01.05.2003 | [2006/05] | WO2003US13475 | Priority number, date | US20020137509 | 01.05.2002 Original published format: US 137509 | US20030389871 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: US 389871 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03092650 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1620069 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620069 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/4174, A61K31/415, A61K31/496 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
A61K47/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/34 (KR);
A61K31/415 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4174 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K9/0034 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4174, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | ERWÄRMENDE UND NICHT IRRITIERENDE ANTIFUNGALE SCHMIERMITTELZUBEREITUNG IN GELFORM | [2007/46] | English: | WARMING AND NONIRRITATING LUBRICANT FUNGICIDE COMPOSITIONS IN THE FORM OF A GEL | [2007/42] | French: | COMPOSITIONS LUBRIFIANTES, FONGICIDES, NON-IRRITATIVES ET CHAUFFANTES SOUS FORME DE GEL | [2007/42] |
Former [2006/05] | ERWÄRMENDE UND NON-IRRITATIVE ANTIFUNGALE SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG IN GELFORM | ||
Former [2006/05] | WARNING AND NONIRRITATING LUBRICANT FUNGICIDE COMPOSITIONS IN THE FORM OF A GEL | ||
Former [2006/05] | COMPOSITIONS, FONGICIDES, NON IRRITATIVES ET CHAUFFANTES LUBRIFIANTES SOUS FORME DE GEL | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | RO | 28.05.2008 | SI | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | HU | 29.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
HU | 29.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
GR | 29.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
RO | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SI | 28.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 28.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4636520 (UMIO SUMINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,12-16,18 * example 6 *; | [XY]EP0404376 (CURATEK PHARMACEUTICALS [US]) [X] 1-17 * example 6 * [Y] 18; | [X]US5002938 (WANG JONAS [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,16,18 * column 5, line 25 - column 5, line 38; examples 1-8; claims 1-32 *; | [Y]EP0581581 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [Y] 1-13,17 * page 4, lines 16-31; example 1; table 1 *; | [Y]US5696164 (SUN YING [US], et al) [Y] 18 * example L *; | [XY]US5840744 (BORGMAN ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1-17 * examples 6,12; claims 1-31,41 * [Y] 18; | [Y]US5885591 (AHMAD NAWAZ [US], et al) [Y] 1-13,17 * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 64; example 1 *; | [X]WO0105400 (SHOEI CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * examples 25,28 *; | [XP]WO02087570 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [XP] 1-5,10,12-16* page 2, lines 23-25; examples 4,5 * |