EP1649533 - A SEALING STRUCTURE FORPOLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuelcellpower Co. Ltd. 101 D dong Bundangtechnopark, 151 Yatap-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si 463-816 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Ho-Suk 209-13 Gui 3-dong, Gwangjin-gu 143-203 Seoul / KR | 02 /
SHINN, Mee-Nam 201, 383-11 Yatop-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si 463-070 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
HONG, Byung-Sun E-3, 300-7 Pyeongchang-ri, Yangji-myeon, Yongin-si 449-821 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
OH, Sung-Jin; 201-201 Gwanak Hyundai APT 410 Sangdo 5-dong Dongjak-gu, 156-035 Seoul / KR | 05 /
YANG, Cheol-Nam@807-601 Jeongdeun Maeul Hanjin 8danji Apt Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si 463-758 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
SEO, Yong-Jung; 106-1704 Shinhan APT. 94-3 Jeung po-dong Icheon-si, 467-110 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
KIM, Ho-Suk 209-13 Gui 3-dong, Gwangjin-gu 143-203 Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
SHINN, Mee-Nam 201, 383-11 Yatop-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si 463-070 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
HONG, Byung-Sun E-3, 300-7 Pyeongchang-ri, Yangji-myeon, Yongin-si 449-821 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
OH, Sung-Jin; 201-201 Gwanak Hyundai APT 410 Sangdo 5-dong Dongjak-gu, 156-035 Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
YANG, Cheol-Nam 807-601 Jeongdeun Maeul Hanjin 8danji Apt Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si 463-758 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
SEO, Yong-Jung; 106-1704 Shinhan APT., 94-3 Jeung po-dong Icheon-si, 467-110 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
KIM, Ho-Suk 209-13 Gui 3-dong, Gwangjin-gu 143-203 Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
SHINN, Mee-Nam 201, 383-11 Yatop-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si 463-070 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
HONG, Byung-Sun E-3, 300-7 Pyeongchang-ri, Yangji-myeon, Yongin-si 449-821 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
OH, Sung-Jin; 201-201 Gwanak Hyundai APT 410 Sangdo 5-dong Dongjak-gu, 156-035 Seoul / KR | |||
05 /
YANG, Cheol-Nam 136 Jugong 1 Danji, 955-1 Yeongt ong-dong Suwon-si, 442-470 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
SEO, Yong-Jung; 106-1704 Shinhan APT., 94-3 Jeung po-dong Icheon-si, 467-110 Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/17] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03817081.7 | 23.06.2003 | [2006/17] | WO2003KR01226 | Priority number, date | KR20030035241 | 02.06.2003 Original published format: KR 2003035241 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004107488 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649533 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1649533 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H01M8/0284 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/0221 (EP,US);
H01M8/0282 (EP,US);
H01M8/24 (KR);
H01M8/0263 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | DICHTSTRUKTUR FÜR EINE POLYMERELEKTROLYT-BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2006/17] | English: | A SEALING STRUCTURE FORPOLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL | [2006/17] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ETANCHEITE POUR PILE A COMBUSTIBLE A ELECTROLYTE POLYMERE | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 27.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2003 | AT | 26.09.2012 | BE | 26.09.2012 | CY | 26.09.2012 | CZ | 26.09.2012 | DK | 26.09.2012 | EE | 26.09.2012 | FI | 26.09.2012 | IT | 26.09.2012 | MC | 26.09.2012 | RO | 26.09.2012 | SE | 26.09.2012 | SI | 26.09.2012 | SK | 26.09.2012 | TR | 26.09.2012 | BG | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.12.2012 | ES | 06.01.2013 | PT | 28.01.2013 | IE | 23.06.2013 | LU | 23.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
IE | 23.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
IE | 23.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
IT | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
ES | 06.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 26.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6261711 (MATLOCK RICHARD R [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9 * figure 7 * * figure 8 * * column 1, line 2 - line 3 * * column 4, line 1 * * column 5, line 39 - line 45 * * column 6, line 25 - line 27 * * column 7, line 16 - line 19 * [Y] 2-4; | [A]DE10121176 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9; | [Y]WO03007408 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4 * figure 5 * * abstract *; | [A]US2003031914 (FRANK DAVID G [CA], et al) [A] 1-9; | EP1416555 [ ] (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * figure 5 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] ** paragraph [0051] * | International search | [A]US6440597 (MIZUNO SEIJI [JP]); | [A]US2002055027 (INOUE MASAJIROU [JP], et al); | [A]US4533455 (BALKO EDWARD N [US], et al) | Examination | US2002055032 |