EP1651063 - FRUIT CLEANSING APPARATUS WITH DUST DISPOSAL MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JEJU CITRUS GROWER'S AGRICULTURAL COOPERATIVE 155, Gangjung-dong Sogwipo-city, Jeju-do 697-801 / KR | [2013/08] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states JEJU CITRUS GROWER'S AGRICULTURAL COOPERATIVE 155, Gangjung-dong, Sogwipo-city Jeju-do 697-801 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Hong-sik 441-23, Seohong-dong Sogwipo-city, Jeju-do 697-815 / KR | [2013/08] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
OH, Hong-sik 441-23, Seohong-dong, Sogwipo-city Jeju-do 697-815 / KR | Representative(s) | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/18] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03817801.8 | 07.08.2003 | [2006/18] | WO2003KR01591 | Priority number, date | KR20030052219 | 29.07.2003 Original published format: KR 2003052219 | [2006/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005011410 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651063 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651063 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23N12/02, A23N12/00, B01D47/02 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
A23N12/005 (EP);
A23N12/00 (KR);
A23N15/00 (KR);
B01D47/021 (EP);
Y02A40/90 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/18] | A23N12/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Title | German: | OBSTREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT STAUBENTSORGUNGSMITTEL | [2006/18] | English: | FRUIT CLEANSING APPARATUS WITH DUST DISPOSAL MEANS | [2006/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DE FRUITS ÉQUIPÉ DE MOYENS D'ÉVACUATION DE POUSSIÈRE | [2013/08] |
Former [2006/18] | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DE FRUITS EQUIPE DE MOYENS D'EVACUATION DE POUSSIERE | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2003 | Translation filed | 03.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 14.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.12.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2003 | AT | 26.06.2013 | BE | 26.06.2013 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | DK | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | NL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | IE | 07.08.2013 | LU | 07.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | FR | 02.09.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | GB | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | DE | 01.03.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GB | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GB | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GB | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
DE | 01.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2073837 (GHENT WILLIAM E) [A] 1 * page 4, column l, line 21 - line 60; figures 1,4,5 * * page 5, column r, line 24 - line 56 *; | [A]US2199831 (GEORGE CUNNING THOMAS) [A] 1 * page 1, column l, line 1 - line 37; figures 5,7 * * page 2, column l, line 47 - line 72 * * page 5, column l, line 69 - column r, line 27 *; | [A]CH412807 (BUTZ HEINZ [CH]) [A] 1,5 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2939367 (KUEHN HEINRICH) [A] 1,5* page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2507865 (PREZIA GIROLAMO [IT]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 10; figure 1 * | International search | [XE]KR20030067607 (JEJU CITRUS GROWER S AGRICULTU [KR]); | [A]JPH0838136 (SASHINAMI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]JPS6137794U ; | [A]US5285548 (MOLL CHRISTOPHER A [US]); | [A]US5329845 (BICHEL RONALD A [US]) |