EP1648804 - APPARATUS FOR LOADING AND UNLOADING CARGO AT SEA-SIDE OF SHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Han AH Engineering Co., Ltd. Kwansesa B/D 4FL 209-9 Nonhyun-dong, Kangnam-ku Seoul 135-010 / KR | For all designated states Jeong, Gong-il Jugong Apt. 10 1010-403, 65 Jungang-dong Gyeonggi-do Gwacheon-si 427-806 / KR | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Gong-il Jugong Apt. 10, 1010-403, 65 Jungang-dong Gyeonggi-do, Gwacheon-si 427-806 / KR | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Bernhard Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Wagner, Bernhard Peter ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03817807.5 | 02.10.2003 | [2006/17] | WO2003KR02030 | Priority number, date | KR20030052418 | 29.07.2003 Original published format: KR 2003052418 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005012149 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648804 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1648804 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65G67/60 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
E02B3/068 (EP,US);
B65G67/60 (KR);
B65G63/045 (EP,US);
B65G67/603 (EP,US);
B66C19/002 (EP,US);
B66C23/52 (EP,US);
Y02A10/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN UND ENTLADEN VON FRACHT AUF DER WASSERSEITE EINES SCHIFFS | [2006/17] | English: | APPARATUS FOR LOADING AND UNLOADING CARGO AT SEA-SIDE OF SHIP | [2006/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT ET DE DECHARGEMENT DE MARCHANDISES SUR LE COTE MARITIME D'UN BATEAU | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 27.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2008 | BE | 17.12.2008 | CY | 17.12.2008 | CZ | 17.12.2008 | DK | 17.12.2008 | EE | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | IT | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | RO | 17.12.2008 | SI | 17.12.2008 | SK | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | BG | 17.03.2009 | SE | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | ES | 28.03.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | HU | 18.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
HU | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000226122 ; | [Y]US3846860 (KUMMERMAN H) [Y] 4,6-8* column 10, line 53 - column 11, line 10; figure 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000226122 A 20000815 (NKK CORP) [X] 1,9 * abstract * [Y] 4,6-8 | International search | [A]JPH06247562 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [A]JPH09202456 (TSUJI HEAVY IND); | [X]JP2000226122 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) |