EP1652402 - PACKET AND OPTICAL ROUTING EQUIPMENT AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Piazza degli Affari 2 20123 Milano / IT | For all designated states Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 10 20123 Milano / IT | [2008/11] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Piazza degli Affari 2 20123 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAVAZZONI, Carlo c/o Telecom Italia S.p.A., Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | 02 /
D'ALESSANDRO, Alessandro c/o Telecom Italia S.p.A., Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | [2008/11] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
PIRELLI & C. S.P.A. Via Gaetano Negri, 10 I-20123 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
CAVAZZONI, Carlo Telecom Italia S.p.A., Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | |||
03 /
D'ALESSANDRO, Alessandro Telecom Italia S.P.A., Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Bergadano, Mirko Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2006/18] | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni Pirelli & C. S.p.A., Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milan / IT | Application number, filing date | 03817942.0 | 07.08.2003 | [2006/18] | WO2003EP08727 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005015944 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652402 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1652402 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1652402 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
H04J14/0227 (EP,US);
H04J14/021 (EP,US);
H04J14/0241 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0062 (EP,US);
H04J14/0201 (EP,US);
H04J14/0209 (EP,US);
H04J14/0219 (EP,US);
H04J14/0283 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0066 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0071 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAKET UND OPTISCHE LEITWEGLENKGERÄTE UND VERFAHREN | [2006/18] | English: | PACKET AND OPTICAL ROUTING EQUIPMENT AND METHOD | [2006/18] | French: | MATERIEL ET PROCEDE D'ACHEMINEMENT OPTIQUE DE PAQUETS | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | BE | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | PT | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | IE | 07.08.2008 | LU | 07.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | [2011/47] |
Former [2011/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0818940 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-17 * figure 9 *; | [A]US5920412 (CHANG NING [US]) [A] 1-19 * figure 4 *; | [DA]EP1076468 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [DA] * figure 4 *; | [XA]EP1091529 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,13,14 * column 4, line 4 - line 49; figure 1a * [A] 2-12,15-17; | [DA]US2002018269 (CHAUDHURI SID [US], et al) [DA] * figure 1 * |