EP1665474 - BUSBAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto, Reinhard Leyrergasse 6 2410 Hainburg / AT | For all designated states Hauer, Hansjörg Dr. Kühne-Gasse 14 1230 Wien / AT | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Laminger, Norbert, et al Pinter, Laminger & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Laminger, Norbert, et al Patentanwälte Klein, Pinter & Laminger OEG Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03818478.4 | 09.09.2003 | [2006/23] | WO2003AT00264 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005025011 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1665474 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R25/14 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
H01R25/142 (EP,US);
H01R25/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMSCHIENEN-SYSTEM | [2006/23] | English: | BUSBAR SYSTEM | [2006/23] | French: | SYSTEME BARRE OMNIBUS | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 03.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0060706 (OTTO REINHARD [AT]) [Y] 1-15,26-32,43 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 20; figures 2a,4a *; | [Y]CH558914 (BUERGISSER ROBERT) [Y] 1-15,26-32,43 * column 1, line 29 - line 68; figure . *; | [YA]EP0453267 (ASHLEY & ROCK LTD [GB]) [Y] 15 * page 6, column 9, line 22 - column 10, line 58; figures 10-20 * [A] 16-25; | [Y]EP0106535 (MK ELECTRIC LTD [GB]) [Y] 26-28 * page 11, line 18 - line 34 * * page 12, line 21 - line 35; figures 9,13 *; | [X]DE4110251 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 37-42 * the whole document *; | [YA]DE4121639 (DORMA GLAS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 29-32 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 5; figure 1 * [A] 33-36 | by applicant | DE3632414 | EP0453267 | CH558914 | US5759051 | EP0159078 | US3337697 |