EP1662535 - FLUORESCENT LAMP AND FERRULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osram-Melco Ltd. 8-29, Kita-Saiwai 2-chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama Kanagawa 220-0004 / JP | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Mitsuhiro, c/o OSRAM-MELCO Ltd Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa, Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | 02 /
OSAWA, Takashi, c/o OSRAM-MELCO Ltd Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa, Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | 03 /
TAKEDA, Masaomi, c/o OSRAM-MELCO Ltd Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa, Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | 04 /
KOKUFU, Koji, c/o OSRAM-MELCO Ltd Kakegawa Factory 64, Tanyo Kakegawa, Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | [2012/04] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
IKEDA, Mitsuhiro, c/o OSRAM-MELCO Ltd Kakegawa Factory, 64, Tanyo Kakegawa, Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | ||
02 /
OSAWA, Takashi, c/o OSRAM-MELCO Ltd Kakegawa Factory, 64, Tanyo Kakegawa, Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKEDA, Masaomi, c/o OSRAM-MELCO Ltd Kakegawa Factory, 64, Tanyo Kakegawa, Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | |||
04 /
KOKUFU, Koji, c/o OSRAM-MELCO Ltd Kakegawa Factory, 64, Tanyo Kakegawa, Shizuoka 436-0082 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03818559.1 | 02.09.2003 | [2006/22] | WO2003JP11207 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005024883 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662535 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662535 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01K3/22, F21V19/00, H01J5/50, H01J61/32 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H01J5/54 (EP,US);
F21V19/0095 (EP,US);
H01J5/50 (EP,US);
H01J5/56 (EP,US);
H01J61/327 (EP,US);
H01K3/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | H01J5/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, HU, NL [2006/49] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LEUCHTSTOFFLAMPE UND FERRULE | [2006/22] | English: | FLUORESCENT LAMP AND FERRULE | [2006/22] | French: | LAMPE FLUORESCENTE ET CAPSULE DE CONTACT | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2005 | Translation filed | 18.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10003993.2 / EP2228816 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2454326 (WILLIAM MAKENNY) [X] 1,4,5,16,18 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 28 * * figure -- *; | [X]US4326146 (PLAGGE VERNON L, et al) [X] 1-3,15-17,22 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 7 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4985656 (WESTLUND JR ARNOLD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15-17,22 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 44 ** figure -- * | International search | [A]JPS59184432 (NIPPON DENKI HOME ELECTRONICS); | [A]JP2001307680 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JPH08273602 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) | by applicant | JPH08273602 | US4326146 | US2454326 | US4985656 |