EP1667593 - DYNAMIC DAMPING ELEMENT FOR TWO BONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMANN, Stephan Poststrasse 2 CH-4500 Solothurn / CH | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Lusuardi, Werther, et al Dr. Lusuardi AG Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Lusuardi, Werther, et al Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8 8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03818771.2 | 29.09.2003 | [2006/24] | WO2003CH00649 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005030068 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667593 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/7025 (EP,US);
A61B17/7031 (EP,US);
A61B17/7004 (EP,US);
Y10T403/455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFUNGSELEMENT ZUR DYNAMISCHEN VON ZWEI KNOCHEN | [2006/24] | English: | DYNAMIC DAMPING ELEMENT FOR TWO BONES | [2006/24] | French: | ELEMENT AMORTISSEUR ASSURANT LA STABILISATION DYNAMIQUE DE DEUX OS | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2774581 (DIMSO SA [FR]) [X] 1-9 * page 1, line 27 - line 36 * * page 2, line 17 - line 19 * * page 2, line 31 - line 32 * * page 3, line 1 - line 3 * * page 3, line 7 - line 8 * * page 4, line 10 - line 25 * * page 5, line 10 - line 25 * * page 7, line 20 - line 32 * * figures 2,7,8 *; | [A]US6267764 (ELBERG JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1-4,6,9,13 * column 5, line 48 - line 55; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5645599 (SAMANI JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1-4 * column A; figure 5 * * column 4, line 44 - line 51 *; | [DA]FR2812186 (SPINE NEXT SA [FR]) | by applicant | FR2812186 |