EP1676403 - METHOD FOR SERIAL ALLOCATION OF ADDRESSES AND MONITORING THE ADDRESS ALLOCATION IN A BUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELMOS Semiconductor AG Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 1 44227 Dortmund / DE | For all designated states Johnson Electric Switzerland AG Bahnhofstrasse 18 3280 Murten / CH | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states ELMOS Semiconductor AG Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 1 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
For all designated states Johnson Electric Switzerland AG Bahnhofstrasse 18 3280 Murten / CH | |||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states ELMOS Semiconductor AG Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 1 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
For all designated states SAIA-Burgess Murten AG Bahnhofstrasse 18 3280 Murten / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEGER, Roland Fuchsweg 5 71093 Weil im Schönbuch / DE | 02 /
BOURQUI, Bernard Au Fernotz 32 CH-1784 Courtepin / CH | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [2006/27] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 03819019.5 | 24.10.2003 | [2006/27] | WO2003EP11836 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050924 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1676403 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1676403 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/403, H04L29/12, G06F13/40, G06F12/06 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
G06F12/0653 (EP);
H04L12/403 (EP);
H04L61/00 (EP);
H04L61/50 (EP);
G06F12/0661 (EP);
H04L43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SERIELLEN VERGABE VON ADRESSEN UND ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER ADRESSVERGABE IN EINEM BUSSYSTEM | [2006/27] | English: | METHOD FOR SERIAL ALLOCATION OF ADDRESSES AND MONITORING THE ADDRESS ALLOCATION IN A BUS SYSTEM | [2006/27] | French: | PROCEDE D'ATTRIBUTION D'ADRESSES EN SERIE ET DE CONTROLE DE L'ATTRIBUTION D'ADRESSES DANS UN SYSTEME DE BUS | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 28.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2003 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | IT | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | NL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 12.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4773005 (SULLIVAN JAMES P [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 14 * * column 4, lines 4-27 * * column 4, line 60 - column 7, line 38 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9416382 (3DO CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 1, lines 12-16 * * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 31 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 3 * * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 13 * * page 22, lines 25-36 * * page 24, line 34 - page 26, line 16 * * figures 5,6,20; claims 1,4 *; | [A]WO0107974 (PILZ GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 10, paragraph L - page 13, paragraph 4 * * page 14, paragraph L * * page 18, line 5 - page 20, line L ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2002096573 (BRUZY CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0039] - [0046] * * figures 1-5 * |