EP1684989 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HEAT-SENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL COMPRISING A PROTECTIVE LAYER AND COATING MACHINE FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/31] | HEAT-SENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL COMPRISING A PROTECTIVE LAYER, AND METHOD AND COATING MACHINE FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2008/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi HiTec Paper Flensburg GmbH Husumer Strasse 12 24941 Flensburg / DE | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Wolfgang Speckberg 38 24943 Flensburg / DE | 02 /
THEIS, Wolfgang Siriusbogen 49 24943 Flensburg / DE | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Hiller, Volker, et al Mitsubishi HiTec Paper Flensburg GmbH Husumer Strasse 12 24941 Flensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Hiller, Volker, et al Mitsubishi HiTec Paper Flensburg GmbH Husumer Strasse 12 24941 Flensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03819052.6 | 12.11.2003 | [2006/31] | WO2003EP12609 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051673 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684989 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684989 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00, B41M5/30 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
B41M5/405 (EP);
B41M7/0045 (EP);
B41M7/0081 (EP);
B05C1/083 (EP);
B05C1/0834 (EP);
D21H23/72 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/31] | B41M7/00, B41M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHEN AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIALS MIT SCHUTZSCHICHT UND STREICHMASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN | [2008/25] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HEAT-SENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL COMPRISING A PROTECTIVE LAYER AND COATING MACHINE FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2008/25] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MATERIAU D'ENREGISTREMENT THERMOSENSIBLE COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE DE PROTECTION ET MACHINE DE COUCHAGE DESTINEE A LA FABRICATION DUDIT MATERIAU | [2008/25] |
Former [2006/31] | WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL MIT SCHUTZSCHICHT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN UND STREICHMASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN | ||
Former [2006/31] | HEAT-SENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL COMPRISING A PROTECTIVE LAYER, AND METHOD AND COATING MACHINE FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2006/31] | MATERIAU D'ENREGISTREMENT THERMOSENSIBLE COMPORTANT UNE COUCHE DE PROTECTION, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET MACHINE DE COUCHAGE DESTINEE A LA FABRICATION DUDIT MATERIAU | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 05.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.10.2008 | CZ | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | EE | 29.10.2008 | IE | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | RO | 29.10.2008 | SI | 29.10.2008 | SK | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | AT | 12.11.2008 | LU | 12.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | BG | 29.01.2009 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | HU | 30.04.2009 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 29.10.2008 | |
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
TR | 29.10.2008 | ||
AT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 29.10.2008 | |
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
AT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
AT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
AT | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 29.10.2008 | |
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 29.10.2008 | |
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | DK | 29.10.2008 | |
IE | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | NL | 29.10.2008 | |
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | NL | 29.10.2008 | |
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | BG | 29.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0344705 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] * example 1 *; | [A]AT397636B (SKIDATA GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0623909 (STANDARD REGISTER CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 34 - line 57; claims 1-3,7,11,12,14,15 * [Y] 7-10,16,17,19,23-29; | [Y]DE19912054 (INST OBERFLAECHENMODIFIZIERUNG [DE]) [Y] 7-10,16,17,19,23-29 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]US6346148 (RANTANEN RAUNO VERNER [FI]) [A] 16-29 * column W *; | [A]US6562755 (HALBROOK JR WENDELL B [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 1, line 6 - line 37 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 32 * * column 8, line 28 - line 54 *; | [E]DE10241903 (MITSUBISHI HITEC PAPER FLENSBU [DE]) [E] 1-29 * the whole document * |