EP1651654 - METHOD FOR MAKING ALKYHALOSILANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Larry, Neil 7 Harvest Drive Scotia, NY 12302 / US | 02 /
CRAWFORD, Alan, Carson 54 Waterview Drive Saratoga Springs, NY 12866 / US | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Szary, Anne Catherine London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03819319.9 | 31.07.2003 | [2006/18] | WO2003US23920 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005082913 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651654 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/16 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
C07F7/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT [2006/45] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKYHALOGENSILANEN | [2006/18] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING ALKYHALOSILANES | [2006/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ALKYLHALOSILANES | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1184387 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1-15 * claims; page 2 - page 4 *; | [X]EP1156051 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1-15 * claims; page 2 - page 4 *; | [X]EP1055675 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1-15 * claims, examples; page 2 - page 3 *; | [PX]US2002156310 (ARAMATA MIKIO ET AL) [PX] 1-15 * claims, examples; page 2 - page 3 *; | [X]US6365766 (SHIROTA YOSHIHIRO ET AL) [X] 1-15 * examples;; table 1 *; | [X]US6288258 (ARAMATA MIKIO ET AL) [X] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [X]US4864044 (LEWIS KENRICK M ET AL) [X] 1-15 * examples;; tables 2,5 * |