EP1435416 - Drainage channel and method for producing such a drainage channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACO SEVERIN AHLMANN GMBH & CO. KG Am Ahlmannkai 24755 Rendsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states ACO Severin Ahlmann GmbH & Co. KG Am Ahlmannkai 24755 Rendsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/28] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04000052.3 | 05.01.2004 | [2004/28] | Priority number, date | CH20030000007 | 06.01.2003 Original published format: CH 72003 | [2004/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435416 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E03F3/04 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
E03F3/046 (EP);
E01C11/227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GR, IT, LI [2005/13] |
Former [2004/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entwässerungsrinne sowie Verfahren zum Herstellen einer solchen Entwässerungsrinne | [2004/28] | English: | Drainage channel and method for producing such a drainage channel | [2004/28] | French: | Caniveau d'écoulement et méthode de production d'un tel caniveau d'écoulement | [2004/28] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB491059 (JOHANNUS FLORIS PHILIPPUS HERS) [X] 1,2,8,12,18 * page 1, line 24 - line 51 * * figure - * [A] 4,13; | [X]DE4117431 (FRIESECKE GERHART [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,18 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2272711 (ULM EDELSTAHL TECH [DE]) [A] 1,13-17,21* page 5, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 3; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE4326110 (ZINK WALTER [DE]) [A] 1,4-8,12,14 * the whole document *; | [XA]US6129838 (MILLNER DAVID [US]) [X] 1,4,5,8,10 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 8; figure - * [A] 2,3,14,18-20 |