EP1450124 - Heat exchanger tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kania, Guido Schlossweg 43 91080 Marloffstein / DE | 02 /
Hendel, Roland Eisgrund 5 91086 Aurachtal / DE | [2004/35] | Application number, filing date | 04000488.9 | 13.01.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | DE2003201249U | 28.01.2003 Original published format: DE 20301249 U | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1450124 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1450124 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450124 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28F21/06 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
B32B1/08 (EP);
F16L9/133 (EP);
F28F21/062 (EP);
B29C48/0012 (EP);
B29C48/09 (EP);
B29C48/18 (EP);
B29K2105/04 (EP);
B29K2105/16 (EP);
B29K2307/00 (EP);
B29K2309/08 (EP);
B29K2995/0005 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | MK | 07.09.2007 | Title | German: | Wärmetauscherrohr | [2004/35] | English: | Heat exchanger tube | [2004/35] | French: | Tube d'échange de chaleur | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | MC | 31.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | EE | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/09] | EE | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 27.05.2009 | |
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | FI | 27.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1178685 (REDLAND PIPES LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3320273 (BECKER PRUENTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* figure - *; | [A]EP0492129 (EX CELL O CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figure - * |