EP1441067 - Profiled grid element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAURATON GmbH & Co. KG Werkstrasse 13 + 14 76437 Rastatt / DE | [2006/33] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states HAURATON BETONWARENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG Werkstrasse 13+14 76437 Rastatt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naujoks, Volker Starenweg 1 76476 Bischweier / DE | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Geitz Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kriegsstrasse 234 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht Patentanwälte Kriegsstrasse 234 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 04000601.7 | 14.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | DE20032000474U | 14.01.2003 Original published format: DE 20300474 U | [2004/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1441067 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1441067 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441067 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01C9/00, E04C2/42, E04F15/02, E04F15/10 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
E04C2/427 (EP);
E01C9/004 (EP);
E04F15/105 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/31] | E01C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Profilgitterelement | [2004/31] | English: | Profiled grid element | [2004/31] | French: | Elément de treillis profilé | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 09.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IE | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | GB | 14.01.2009 | LU | 14.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2009 | ||
LU | 14.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2009 | ||
LU | 14.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
GB | 14.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IE | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0853161 (COOPER CLARKE GROUP PLC [GB]) [DA] 1,8,12 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19802885 (WEBER ALFRED [DE]) [DA] 1,8,9,12* the whole document *; | [A]DE10062711 (RITTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,8,12 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0853161 | DE19802885 |