EP1408628 - TDMA-CDMA mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miya, Kazuyuki 1-14-18, Kyoudou, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-0052 o / JP | 02 /
Kato, Osamu 5-45-F101, Shonan Takatori, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken, 237-0066 / JP | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/16] | 01 /
Miya, Kazuyuki 2612-28, Kanai-cho Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, Osamu 2-14-10-205, Hiyoshi Kohoku-ku Yokohama / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/16] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04000783.3 | 30.01.1995 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | JP19940009611 | 31.01.1994 Original published format: JP 961194 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1408628 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
H04B1/406 (EP,US);
H04B7/2618 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04L7/04 (EP,US);
H04W16/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/16] | Title | German: | TDMA-CDMA mobile Kommunikationsanordnung | [2004/16] | English: | TDMA-CDMA mobile communication system | [2004/16] | French: | Système de communication mobile TDMA/CDMA | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/21] | 28.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95101226.9 / EP0665659 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9210891 (SCS MOBILECOM INC [US]) [A] 1* page 1, line 3 - line 7; figures 1,2,4,6-8; table 1 *; | [Y]EP0566257 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 24 - line 39; figures 1,2,4,6-8; table 1 * * page 5, line 43 - line 44; figures 1,2,4,6-8; table 1 *; | [Y]WO9401956 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 10; figures 1,2,4,6-8; table 1 * * page 6, line 6 - page 8, line 30; figures 1,2,4,6-8; table 1 * |