EP1443374 - Working control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Shingo Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Hiroshi Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Kanbayashi, Satoshi Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Kurita, Katsuyuki Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2005/09] |
Former [2004/32] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | |||
03 /
* * * | |||
04 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Reichert & Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Kaflerstrasse 15 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Seeger Seeger Lindner Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Paosostrasse 95 81249 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/32] | Seeger, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001039.9 | 20.01.2004 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | JP20030024866 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003024866 | JP20030202592 | 28.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003202592 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1443374 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1443374 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4093, G05B19/4097 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
G05B19/4097 (EP,US);
G05B19/40937 (EP,US);
G05B19/40938 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35084 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35529 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35531 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36284 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36289 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36296 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36352 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36357 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49086 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/29] | G05B19/4093 | ||
Former IPC [2004/32] | G05B19/4097 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/49] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Betriebssteuerung | [2004/32] | English: | Working control device | [2004/32] | French: | Dispositif de commande de fonctionnement | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60127946 ; | [A]JPH01216745 ; | [A]JPS60127946 (FANUC LTD) [A] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0198927 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 18,19 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 23 * * page 11, line 26 - page 14, line 28 *; | [A]JPH01216745 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD) [A] 16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0501494 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 6,7 * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 13 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 12 * * page 12, lines 15-31 * * figures 4-12 *; | [A]US5276606 (MIZUKAMI YUTO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,15,20,21 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 51 * * figures 7-9 *; | [A]US5383131 (ITAMOTO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 22-26 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 63 * * column 5, lines 19-40 * * figure 10 *; | [A]EP0664186 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 11 * page 24, line 53 - page 28, line 30 * * figures 7-11 *; | [X]EP0881034 (MORI SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [X] 4 * column 3, lines 38-56 * * column 7, line 12 - column 9, line 20 * * column 14, lines 12-32 * * figures 2,3,15 *; | [A]EP0913229 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE [JP]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0024] * * figures 3,4; claim 34 *; | [XYA]EP1034880 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE [JP]) [X] 3,4,5,14 * paragraphs [0013] , [0019] , [0020] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0023] , [0047] , [0055] , [0056] , [0076] , [0084] , [0104] * * figures 1,2,30,31 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0034] - [0039] - [0099] * * figure 17 * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0106] * [Y] 16 [A] 6,11; | [X]EP1065029 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,15,20,21,4 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0035] * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0039] * * figures 2-7 *; | [A]EP1087277 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 13 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US2001000805 (KADONO MITSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 9,10 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]EP1132789 (KAKINO YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0057] * * figure 8 *; | [XA]EP1217482 (MORI SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9,15,20,21 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 1-3,5 * * figures 12-17 * [A] 18,19,8,13,22-26; | [A] - YUAN-JYE TSENG ET AL, "RECOGNIZING MULTIPLE INTERPRETATIONS OF INTERACTING MACHINING FEATURES", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (19940901), vol. 26, no. 9, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 667 - 688, XP000468868 [A] 7,12,13 * abstract * * page 671 - page 674 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4485(94)90018-3 | [A] - VAN DEN BERG E ET AL, "Freeform feature modelling: concepts and prospects", COMPUTERS IN INDUSTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200210), vol. 49, no. 2, ISSN 0166-3615, pages 217 - 233, XP004387771 [A] 8,11 * page 229 * * figure 8 * | [A] - FERREIRA J C E ET AL, "CONVEX HULL-BASED FEATURE-RECOGNITION METHOD FOR 2.5D COMPONENTS", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (199001), vol. 22, no. 1, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 41 - 49, XP000136085 [A] 11,12 * abstract * * page 44, column 2 - page 45, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4485(90)90028-B | [A] - M C W ET AL, "Analysis on machined feature recognition techniques based on B-rep", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (199608), vol. 28, no. 8, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 603 - 616, XP004022678 [A] 9 * abstract * * page 613 * * figure 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4485(95)00075-5 | [A] - SURESH K ET AL, "CONSTANT SCALLOP-HEIGHT MACHINING OF FREE-FORM SURFACES", TRANSACTIONS OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, SERIES B: JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING FOR INDUSTRY, ASME. NEW YORK, US, (19940501), vol. 116, no. 2, ISSN 0022-0817, pages 253 - 259, XP000457107 [A] 18,19 * page 253 - page 255 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851113), vol. 009, no. 286, Database accession no. (M - 429), & JP60127946 A 19850708 (FANUC KK) [A] 9,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891124), vol. 013, no. 528, Database accession no. (M - 898), & JP01216745 A 19890830 (TOYODA MACH WORKS LTD) [A] 16,17 * abstract * |