EP1440727 - Membrane flux enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2015 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPECIAL MEMBRANE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 4115 Avenida de la Plata Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | [2004/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cummings, James A. 1211 Montros Place Escondido CA 92027 / US | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 DE-70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001070.4 | 20.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | US20030348482 | 20.01.2003 Original published format: US 348482 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440727 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1440727 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D69/02, B01D71/34, B01D71/42, B01D71/68 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D67/0088 (EP,US);
B01D71/34 (EP,US);
B01D71/42 (EP);
B01D71/421 (US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/31] | B01D67/00, B01D69/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | Methode zur Erhöhung des transmembranen Flusses | [2004/31] | English: | Membrane flux enhancement | [2004/31] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter le flux transmembranaire | [2008/04] |
Former [2004/31] | Procédé pour augmenter le flux traversant sur une membrane | Examination procedure | 08.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2006 | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2008 | BE | 16.07.2008 | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | HU | 17.01.2009 | IE | 20.01.2009 | LU | 20.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
LU | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
LU | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
IE | 20.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 16.07.2008 | |
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4087388 (JENSEN JAMES HENRY, et al) [DX] 1,5,7 * column 15, line 59 - column 16, line 9; example 4; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US4113912 (OKITA KOICHI) [A] 1-10 * example -; claims 1,3,5,25,27 *; | [X]US4794002 (HENIS JAY M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,10 * column 1, line 46 - line 59; examples 1,4,11; claims 1,4,10,13 *; | [DX]US4802987 (BLACK LAURA E [CA]) [DX] 1,3 * column 3, line 28 - line 37; example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0445853 (STORK FRIESLAND BV [NL]) [A] 1-4* page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 25; examples 2,3; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0750938 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 7, line 39 - line 50 *; | [X]WO0105492 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,10 * page 1, line 16 - line 22; example 1; claims 1,5,7,10 * * page 9, line 9 - line 33 * |