EP1440699 - Stent with epoxy primer coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheng, Peiwen 366 Breeden Street Santa Rosa, California 95409 / US | 02 /
Sundar, Ranjarajan 3915 Millbrook Drive Santa Rosa, California 95404 / US | 03 /
Kaushik, Patel 506 Peppertree Drive wINDSOR, California 95492 / US | 04 /
Upidi, Kishore 3575 Alkirst Circle Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04001100.9 | 20.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | US20030350787 | 24.01.2003 Original published format: US 350787 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440699 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/10, A61L31/16 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L2300/606 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L63/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/16] |
Former [2004/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stent mit Epoxy-Primer-Beschichtung | [2004/31] | English: | Stent with epoxy primer coating | [2004/31] | French: | Stent ayant un revêtement primaire d'époxyde | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.03.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6099563 (ZHONG SHENG-PING [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 4, lines 29-37 * * column 5, lines 25-30 * * column 6, lines 29-32,60-67 * * column 7, lines 1,2,25-44 * * column 8 * * column 9, lines 1-32,52-60 *; | [X]US2001014717 (HOSSAINY SYED F A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 3, paragraphs 37,41 * * page 4, paragraphs 43,47 * * page 5, paragraph 53 * * page 7, paragraph 64 * * page 8, paragraph 70 * * page 9, paragraphs 82,83,86 * * column 10, paragraphs 91,93 * * column 11, paragraphs 97,98,100,101 * * page 6, paragraph 62 *; | [A]US2002032414 (RAGHEB ANTHONY O [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 2, paragraph 12 * * page 3, paragraph 20 * * page 4, paragraph 45 * * page 6, paragraph 61 ** page 7, paragraphs 63,64,67 * |