EP1449976 - Prefabricated wall element and apparatus and method of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Undrau Anstalt Postfach 55 9492 Eschen / LI | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Berngruber, Otto, et al vP-IP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Türkenstrasse 9 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Berngruber, Otto, et al Patentanwälte Haft, von Puttkamer Berngruber, Karakatsanis Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Berngruber, Otto, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001131.4 | 21.01.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | DE2003107828 | 24.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10307828 | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449976 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/04 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
E04C2/042 (EP);
E04C2/041 (EP);
E04C2002/002 (EP);
E04C2002/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | Mauertafel-Fertigteil-Element sowie Anlage und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [2004/35] | English: | Prefabricated wall element and apparatus and method of manufacturing | [2004/35] | French: | Elément de paroi préfabriqué, installation et méthode de fabrication | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2007 | 31.01.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2116622 (DUPIN ROBERT) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 1, line 21 - page 3, column 11; figures 1,2 * [A] 4; | [A]EP0872609 (HEUBERGER AUGUSTIN DIPL ING [AT]) [A] 7,8,10,11 * column 4, line 7 - line 23; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP1111149 (HARMONY HOLDINGS LTD [VG]) [AD] 10,11* column 6, line 34 - column 8, line 7; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | EP1111248 | EP1111149 |