EP1440672 - Stent delivery system and low profile stent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gittings, Darin C. 520 S. Bayview Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Zimmermann, Gerd Heinrich, et al Zimmermann & Partner, P.O. Box 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001223.9 | 21.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | US20030350582 | 24.01.2003 Original published format: US 350582 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440672 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
A61F2/86 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2230/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/16] |
Former [2004/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anbringen eines Stents, und Stent mit niedrigem Profil | [2004/31] | English: | Stent delivery system and low profile stent | [2004/31] | French: | Système de mise en place d'un stent et stent à profil réduit | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/43] | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0423916 (COOK INC [US]) [A] 1-42* abstract *; | [AD]US5383887 (NADAL GUY [FR]) [AD] 1-42 * figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [AD]WO0106952 (MED INST INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0239888 (ENDOLOGIX INC [US]) [X] 1,7,10,11,13-15,19,22,23,25-27,29,35,38,39,41,42 * abstract * | by applicant | US5383887 | WO0106952 |