EP1410837 - A method for purifying exhaust gas of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Araki, Yasushi Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Mizuno, Tatsuji Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Toshiaki Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001249.4 | 10.09.1996 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | JP19950232695 | 11.09.1995 Original published format: JP 23269595 | JP19950324539 | 13.12.1995 Original published format: JP 32453995 | JP19950312770 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: JP 31277095 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1410837 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1410837 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1410837 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/50, B01D53/94, F01N3/08, F01N3/02, F01N3/28, F01N3/20 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
F02D41/3827 (EP,US);
B01D53/508 (EP,US);
B01D53/9481 (EP,US);
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N3/0821 (EP,US);
F01N3/085 (EP,US);
F01N3/0871 (EP,US);
F01N3/2882 (EP,US);
F02D41/028 (EP,US);
B01D2257/302 (EP,US);
F01N2250/02 (EP,US);
F01N2250/12 (EP,US);
F01N2570/04 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/17] | B01D53/94, B01D53/50, F01N3/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reinigen des Abgases eines Verbrennungsmotors | [2004/17] | English: | A method for purifying exhaust gas of an internal combustion engine | [2004/17] | French: | Méthode pour purifier des gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96114471.4 / EP0761286 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0576771 ; | [A]JPS63150441 ; | [A]JPH02149715 ; | [A]EP0580389 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 41 * * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 25; figure - *; | [A]EP0613714 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 5, line 49 - page 6, line 31 *; | [A]EP0625633 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 9, line 9 - column 12, line 23; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0636770 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 30, line 13 - column 31, line 41; figure - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 18, Database accession no. 93-146240, XP002025326 & JPH0576771 A 19930330 (TOYO KOGYO CO) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881028), vol. 012, no. 409, Database accession no. (M - 758), & JP63150441 A 19880623 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 29, Database accession no. 90-220900, XP002025327 & JPH02149715 A 19900608 (TOYO KOGYO KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |