EP1441486 - Presence system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Masafumi NEC Corporation 5-7-1, Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ito, Naoko NEC Corporation 5-7-1, Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001365.8 | 22.01.2004 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | JP20030013137 | 22.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003013137 | JP20030019298 | 28.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003019298 | JP20030057895 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003057895 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1441486 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1441486 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441486 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04L67/54 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/44] |
Former [2004/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anwesenheitssystem | [2004/31] | English: | Presence system | [2004/31] | French: | Système de présence | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07102346.9 / EP1786172 | EP07102367.5 / EP1786173 | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0145342 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 13, line 16 - page 17, line 16 * * page 20, line 15 - page 24, line 18 * * page 27, line 12 - page 29, line 25 *; | [PX]JP2003296525 (FUJITSU LTD) [PX] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - SILVER A ET AL, "Unified Network Presence Management", WHITE PAPER NORTEL NETWORKS, (2000), pages 1 - 6, XP002234868 [A] 1-14 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 * |