EP1557612 - System for introducing moisture into an oven for cleaning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Opposition rejected | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buzzi, Ermanno Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | 02 /
Doyle, John Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept. V.le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | Application number, filing date | 04001436.7 | 23.01.2004 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557612 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1557612 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24C14/00 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
F24C14/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/16] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Feuchte in einen Ofen für seine Reinigung | [2005/30] | English: | System for introducing moisture into an oven for cleaning | [2005/30] | French: | Système pour l'introduction de l'humidité dans un four pour son nettoyage | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 28.01.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2007
28.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Fürther Strasse 246 90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB, et al, et al Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2007
28.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Fürther Strasse 246 90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Meissner, Bolte & Partner, et al, et al Anwaltssozietät GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2007
28.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhofer Strasse 135 D-90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Schröer, Gernot H., et al, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2007
AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhofer Strasse 135 D-90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Schröer, Gernot H., et al, et al Patentanwälte Meissner, Bolte & Partner Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | 25.09.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.02.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.11.2011 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/23] | 08.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.01.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3331943 (EFF CHRISTIAN A) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 10 - column 1, line 28 * * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 66 * * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 41 *; | [A]DE2842771 (LECHMETALL LANDSBERG GMBH) [A] 1-14 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 10; claim 5 *; | [A]DE19730610 (WIESHEU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2003172962 (RIEFENSTEIN LUTZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1388713 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14* the whole document * |