EP1447515 - Roll-up door with slidable shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Achenbach GmbH & Co.KG Zinzinger Strasse 11 66117 Saarbrücken / DE | [2006/03] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Karl Achenbach GmbH & Co.KG Zinzinger Strasse 11 66117 Saarbrücken / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilges, Fred, Dipl.-Ing. Pfählerstrasse 12 a 66128 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
Parino, Jürgen Mozartstrasse 1 66299 Bildstock / DE | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Vièl, Christof, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske PartGmbB Feldmannstrasse 110 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Vièl, Christof, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske Feldmannstrasse 110 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001774.1 | 28.01.2004 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | DE2003202278U | 12.02.2003 Original published format: DE 20302278 U | [2004/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447515 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1447515 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/174 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
E06B9/174 (EP);
E06B2009/1743 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/34] | Title | German: | Rolltor mit verschieblicher Welle | [2004/34] | English: | Roll-up door with slidable shaft | [2004/34] | French: | Porte enroulable avec arbre déplaçable | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | EE | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | BG | 18.04.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/28] | EE | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1509687 (MUELLER PETER) [A] 1 * figures 3,7,10 *; | [A]EP0441330 (HOERMANN KG [DE]) [A] 1* figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4105975 (WUNDLING HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 13; figure 3 *; | [A]DE19548263 (SCHANZ HANS [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 62; figure 1 * |