EP1452887 - Method for calculating the position of a mobile terminal, positioning system, and position calculation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsunehara, Katsuhiko Hitachi Ltd. Intell.Prop.Grp. New Marunouchi Bldg. 1-5-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Fujishima, Kenzaburo Hitachi Ltd. Intell.Prop.Grp. New Marunouchi Bldg. 1-5-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04001965.5 | 29.01.2004 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | JP20030050919 | 27.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003050919 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1452887 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1452887 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S5/14, G01S11/06 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
G01S5/14 (EP,US);
G01S11/06 (EP,US);
G01S5/0257 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/36] | G01S5/02, G01S5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/12] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Position eines mobilen Endgerätes, Ortungssystem und Vorrichtung zur Positionsbestimmung | [2004/36] | English: | Method for calculating the position of a mobile terminal, positioning system, and position calculation apparatus | [2004/36] | French: | Procédé de détermination de la position d'un terminal mobile, système de localisation et dispositif de détermination de position | [2004/36] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 18.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2012 | 24.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/28] | 05.03.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/28] | 07.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5675344 (TONG LEON [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 1, lines 37-45 *; | [A]US5943014 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 15, line 58 - column 16, line 54 *; | [X]WO0026687 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,8 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 8 * * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 25 - page 7, line 2 *; | [Y]US2001034223 (RIESER CHRISTIAN J [US], et al) [Y] 6,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0061] * * paragraph [0286] *; | [XY]EP1233280 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-14,16,17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0067] - [0083] * * paragraphs [0084] - [0099] * [Y] 6,15; | [A] - WATANABE K ET AL, "A study on the accuracy of a CDMA-based location system", VTC SPRING 2002. IEEE 55TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. BIRMINGHAM, AL, MAY 6 - 9, 2002, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020506), VOL. 1 OF 4. CONF. 55, ISBN 0-7803-7484-3, pages 2018 - 2022, XP010622171 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VTC.2002.1002977 |