EP1447620 - Lighting apparatus with moisture absorbing material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pajer, Istvan Brahmsweg 5 75438 Knittlingen / DE | 02 /
Selinger, Joachim Merowingerstrasse 8 75417 Mühlacker / DE | 03 /
Weiner, Hans Braunstrasse 6 75417 Mühlacker / DE | [2004/34] | Application number, filing date | 04002025.7 | 30.01.2004 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | DE20031006388 | 15.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10306388 | [2004/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1447620 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1447620 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F21V31/03, // F21W101:10 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
F21S45/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/27] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung mit feuchtigkeitsabsorbierendem Material | [2004/34] | English: | Lighting apparatus with moisture absorbing material | [2004/34] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage avec matériau absorbant l'humidité | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 11.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2232465 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,6 * page 4, line 5 - line 22 ** figure 3 *; | [X]US4612607 (SEGOSHI TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 40 - line 50 * * column 2, line 59 - line 65 * * column 3, line 33 - line 38 * * column 3, line 41 - line 66 * * figures 2,3,8,9 *; | [X]US4739458 (YAMAYOSHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * column 1, line 8 - line 17 * * column 1, line 63 - line 68 * * column 2, line 1 - line 38 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 7 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4809144 (SUZUKI TOORU [JP]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 54 - line 55 * * figure 4 *; | [X]FR2716254 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 9 - line 22 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 5 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE3220704 |