EP1445150 - Motorized retracting unit and motorized retractable rearview mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES, LTD. 10-18, Higashigotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 144-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES, LTD. 10-18, Higashigotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 144-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakata, Ikuo Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. Isehara Plant 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken 259-1192 / JP | 02 /
Izumi, Katsuyuki Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. Isehara Plant 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken 259-1192 / JP | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04002481.2 | 04.02.2004 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | JP20030027602 | 04.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003027602 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1445150 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1445150 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/074 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
B60R1/074 (EP,US);
A61H35/00 (KR);
A61H33/0095 (KR);
A61H33/6021 (KR);
A61H33/6068 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/18] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Motorisierte einziehende Einheit und motoriesierte einziehbare Rückspiegel. | [2004/33] | English: | Motorized retracting unit and motorized retractable rearview mirror | [2004/33] | French: | Unité motorisée pour rétracter et rétroviseur rétractable de façon motorisée | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH11240385 ; | [A]EP1275558 (MURAKAMI CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * paragraphs [0042] - [0045] *; | [PA]EP1369301 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-12* figure 11 * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11240385 A 19990907 (ICHIKOH IND LTD) [DX] 1-12 * abstract * |