EP1445460 - Control system for cylinder cutoff internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/34] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sen, Naoto c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1,Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Okada, Tadayoshi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1,Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Akira c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1,Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Nishida, Kenichi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Tomokuni, Yasuhiko c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/43] | 01 /
Sen, Naoto c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1,Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
Okada, Tadayoshi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1,Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Sugiyama, Akira c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1,Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
04 /
Nishida, Kenichi c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
05 /
Tomokuni, Yasuhiko c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
Former [2004/33] | 01 /
Sen, Nato c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
Okada, Tadayoshi c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Sugiyama, Akira c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
04 /
Nishida, Kenichi c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
05 /
Tomokuni, Yasuhiko c/o K.K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 1-4-1,Chuo Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04002561.1 | 05.02.2004 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | JP20030030812 | 07.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003030812 | JP20030136954 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003136954 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1445460 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1445460 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1445460 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/36, F02D41/02, B60K31/02 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
F02D41/0087 (EP,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
F02D41/021 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0605 (EP,US);
B60W2720/106 (EP,US);
B60W2754/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/45] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Steuern der Zylinderabschaltung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/33] | English: | Control system for cylinder cutoff internal combustion engine | [2004/33] | French: | Dispositif de commande de la coupure des cylindres dans un moteur à combustion interne | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 28.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5646851 (O'CONNELL GLENN PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 39 * * column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 16 * * figures 2-6 *; | [A]DE10007136 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP1057677 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,6-10 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * the whole document * [A] 2-5,11-19; | [A]US6307277 (TAMAI GORO [US], et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 34 - column 6, line 20 * | by applicant | JPH09290665 | JPH10103097 |