EP1454663 - Virtual camera control method in three-dimensional video game [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 3-22-7 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | [2007/01] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 3-22-7 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Square Enix Co., Ltd. 3-22-7, Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kazumi c/o Square Enix Co.,Ltd. 4-31-8 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04002571.0 | 05.02.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | JP20030058136 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003058136 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454663 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454663 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/5255 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F13/822 (US);
A63F2300/64 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6661 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/21] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer virtuellen Kamera in einem dreidimensionalen Videospiel | [2004/37] | English: | Virtual camera control method in three-dimensional video game | [2004/37] | French: | Méthode de contrôle d'une caméra virtuelle pour un jeu vidéo tridimensionnel | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0528422 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-27 * page 2, column 2, line 50 - page 3, column 1, line 6 * * page 6, column 9, line 21 - line 48 * * claims 1,2,9,10,17,18 *; | [A]EP1245255 (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-27* abstract * |