EP1447100 - Microbiocidal compositions and disinfecting agents produced from them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bode Chemie GmbH Melanchthonstrasse 27 22525 Hamburg / DE | [2009/26] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Bode Chemie GmbH & Co. KG Melanchthonstrasse 27 22525 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Bode Chemie GmbH & Co. Melanchthonstrasse 27 22525 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ostermeyer, Christiane Wittenbergener Weg 55 22559 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Pietsch, Hanns Dr. Mittelweg 25 20148 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Meyer, Brigitte Edwin-Scharff-Ring 58 22309 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
Bloss, Richard Dr. Hermann-Löns-Weg 15 25462 Rellingen / DE | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Oltmann, Eckhard Paul Hartmann AG Patentwesen (TSP) Postfach 1420 89504 Heidenheim / DE | [2011/41] |
Former [2009/13] | Oltmann, Eckhard Paul Hartmann AG Patentwesen (TSP) Postfach 1420 89504 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | Wilke, Jochen c/o Beiersdorf AG Patentabt./Kst.6713 Unnastrasse 48 D-20245 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04002991.0 | 11.02.2004 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | DE2003106450 | 17.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10306450 | [2004/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447100 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1447100 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/00, A61L2/16, A61L2/23, A01N33/24, C07C291/04 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
A61L2/186 (EP);
A01N33/24 (EP);
A01N43/84 (EP);
A61L2/16 (EP);
A61L2/23 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N33/24, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N33/24, A01N59/06, A01N59/00, A01N37/16 (EP);
A01N43/84, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/84, A01N59/06, A01N59/00, A01N37/16 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/34] | Title | German: | Mikrobizide Wirkstoffkombinationen und daraus hergestellte Desinfektionsmittel | [2004/34] | English: | Microbiocidal compositions and disinfecting agents produced from them | [2004/34] | French: | Compositions microbiocidales et des désinfectants produits à partir d'eux | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 07.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2004 | CY | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | IE | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 12.10.2011 | |
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 12.10.2011 | |
PT | 13.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4331942 (LOEFFLER KARL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4-7 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 24 * * examples 1,2,4-6; claims 1,2,4,5,10 * [Y] 2,3,8-10; | [Y]DE19512588 (BODE CHEMIE GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 2,3,8-10 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 16; example 1; claims 1-5 *; | [X]FR2766724 (IRDEC SA [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 2, lines 18-22 * * page 4, line 10 * * page 8, lines 3-11 * * example 1A *; | [XA]US6168808 (HAMON GODIN CATHERINE [FR], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 19 *[A] 2-5,8-10; | [XA]WO0212431 (HENKEL ECOLAB GMBH & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * page 3, lines 6-14 * * page 6, lines 5-27 * * page 7, lines 5-32 * * examples 1,2,7 * [A] 2,8-10 |