EP1473259 - Conveyor for transporting load carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonifer, Edgar Steinstrasse 15 64839 Muenster / DE | 02 /
D'Onofrio, Mario Johann-Strauss-Strasse 2 63179 Obertshausen / DE | 03 /
Fuchs, Alexander Bodelschwinghstrasse 31 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | 04 /
Kandziora, Johann Am Kaltenborn 35 61462 Königstein/Ts. / DE | 05 /
Ketzer, Georg Altlaufstrasse 31 85635 Höhenkirchen-Siegertsbrunn / DE | 06 /
Reck, Matthias Odenwaldstrasse 132b 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | 07 /
Reckemeier, Hartwig Am Wiesengrund 12 63110 Rodgau / DE | 08 /
Sauer, Alexander Sodener Strasse 37 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2004/45] | Application number, filing date | 04003073.6 | 11.02.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | DE2003118621 | 24.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10318621 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473259 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473259 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/12, B65G21/06 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B65G21/06 (EP,US);
B65G15/12 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0267 (EP,US);
B65G2207/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Title | German: | Förderer zum Transportieren von Lastträgern | [2004/45] | English: | Conveyor for transporting load carriers | [2004/45] | French: | Convoyeur permettant le transport de porte-charges | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 22.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.06.2006 | CZ | 28.06.2006 | EE | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | IE | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | RO | 28.06.2006 | SI | 28.06.2006 | SK | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | BG | 28.09.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | HU | 29.12.2006 | LU | 11.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
TR | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
HU | 29.12.2006 | ||
LU | 11.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 28.06.2006 | |
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
LU | 11.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
RO | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2621022 (MACH SPECIALES MANUTENTION [FR]) [Y] 3,6,39,40 * page 1, line 5 - page 4, line 28 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE8901800U (WOLF MONTAGE AUTOMATIONSANLAGEN & SONDERMASCHINEN GMBH) [Y] 4,10 * page 2, line 1 - line 7 * * page 4, line 7 - line 16 *; | [XY]DE4407163 (WOEHR OTTO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,11,12,17,35 * column 2, line 2 - line 9 * * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 33 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 2-6,10,18,21-23,25-30,39,40; | [Y]EP0858961 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 2,21,25-30 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 58 * * figures 1-5b *; | [Y]US2003014154 (FISCHER BRUNO [CH], et al) [Y] 5,18,22,23 * page 1, paragraph 19 - page 3, paragraph 35 ** figures 1-10 * |