EP1452990 - Wireless terminal advertisement system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usami, Shinya NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Glawe. Delfs. Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003075.1 | 11.02.2004 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | JP20030046775 | 25.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003046775 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1452990 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1452990 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0267 (EP,US);
H04M3/4878 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/03] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Werbungssystem für Funkgeräte | [2004/36] | English: | Wireless terminal advertisement system | [2004/36] | French: | Système de publicité pour terminals sans fils | [2004/36] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 16.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/31] | 12.03.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002085849 ; | JP2002085849 [ ] (MITSUI BUSSAN); | [X]FR2818411 (FRONTEAU LUDOVIC [FR]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - page 6, line 18 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002085849 A 20020326 (MITSUI & CO LTD) [X] 1-11 * abstract * |