EP1522254 - Blood sugar level measuring method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Ok-Kyung Im Rosengrund 6 58239 Schwerte / DE | 02 /
Kim, Yoon-Ok Im Rosengrund 6 58239 Schwerte / DE | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2005/15] | Application number, filing date | 04003188.2 | 12.02.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | JP20030349792 | 08.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003349792 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522254 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/7475 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung des Blutzuckerspiegels | [2005/15] | English: | Blood sugar level measuring method and apparatus | [2005/15] | French: | Appareil de mesure du taux de glycémie | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0128414 (KAUFMANN KIM YUN OAK [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, lines 6-15 * * page 7, lines 5-21 * * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 13 *; | [A]WO0128417 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1,6,10 * page 29, line 3 - page 30, line 9 *; | [Y]US6269314 (IITAWAKI TOMOKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 11; claim 9 *; | [A]WO03010510 (ARGOSE INC [US], et al) [A] 1,6,10 * abstract * * page 21, lines 7-18; claim 25 *; | [A] - KANLUAN T ET AL, "COMPARISON OF PLASMA AND WHOLE BLOOD GLUCOSE DETERMINATION", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1986), Database accession no. PREV198682093889, XP002313054 [A] 1,6,10 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE MEDICAL ASSOCIATION OF THAILAND, (1986), vol. 69, no. 3, ISSN 0125-2208, pages 153 - 157 | [ ] - KANLUAN T ET AL, "COMPARISON OF PLASMA AND WHOLE BLOOD GLUCOSE DETERMINATION", JOURNAL OF THE MEDICAL ASSOCIATION OF THAILAND, (1986), vol. 69, no. 3, ISSN 0125-2208, pages 153 - 157, XP008041322 |