EP1449990 - Method and device for supervising a building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schotemeier, Ingenieurmetallbau GmbH Ochtruper Strasse 80 48455 Bad Bentheim / DE | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Schotemeier, Ingenieurmetallbau GmbH Ochtruper Strasse 80 48455 Bad Bentheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schotemeier, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing. Am Berghang 59 48455 Bad Bentheim / DE | [2004/35] | Application number, filing date | 04003370.6 | 16.02.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | DE2003107407 | 20.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10307407 | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449990 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449990 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/10 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
E05B65/108 (EP);
A62C2/247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichung zur Gebäudeüberwachung | [2004/35] | English: | Method and device for supervising a building | [2004/35] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour surveiller un édifice | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.08.2007 | CZ | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | EE | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | GB | 08.08.2007 | IE | 08.08.2007 | RO | 08.08.2007 | SI | 08.08.2007 | SK | 08.08.2007 | TR | 08.08.2007 | BG | 08.11.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | HU | 09.02.2008 | LU | 16.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | FR | 04.04.2008 | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/13] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
TR | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
HU | 09.02.2008 | ||
LU | 16.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
IT | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
TR | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
HU | 09.02.2008 | ||
LU | 16.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
HU | 09.02.2008 | ||
LU | 16.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
LU | 16.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BG | 08.11.2007 | |
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19507407 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 3, lines 52-54,63,64 * * column 4, lines 19-22,25-31 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, lines 43-47 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 6 *; | [X]EP0693743 (SIGN & LABELS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 1, lines 10-12 * * column 2, lines 15-17 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 22 *; | [X]DE19835039 (LOTZE MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 1, lines 5-8 * * claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP1014008 (HUEBLER SICHERHEIT UND SERVICE [DE]) [A] 2 * column 1, lines 53-56 * * column 2, lines 16-27,38-48 ** claim 10 * |