EP1418337 - Scroll type compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | |||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hisanaga, Shigeru c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Takemoto, Tsuyoshi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Akiyama, Yoshitaka c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Shinichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 05 /
Hayashi, Hiroyuki c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 06 /
Watanabe, Yasushi KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP | 07 /
Mori, Tatsushi KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP | 08 /
Shimizu, Izuru KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP | 09 /
Iguchi, Masao KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Zumstein & Klingseisen Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003426.6 | 27.08.1998 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | JP19970249603 | 29.08.1997 Original published format: JP 24960397 | JP19970236255 | 01.09.1997 Original published format: JP 23625597 | JP19970241472 | 05.09.1997 Original published format: JP 24147297 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418337 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418337 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418337 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02, F04C29/02, F04C29/12 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
F04C29/12 (EP,US);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C29/026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | F04C18/02, F04C29/02, F04C29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2004/20] | F04C18/02, F04C29/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/20] | Title | German: | Spiralverdichter | [2004/20] | English: | Scroll type compressor | [2004/20] | French: | Compresseur à spirales | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 16.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98116193.8 / EP0899460 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0052234 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 4 - page 13, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]US4861245 (TOJO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 36 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0502514 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 19 - line 58; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0520431 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - column 4, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0664396 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 17 - line 30; figure 4; claim 4 *; | [A]US5567137 (NAKASHIMA MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5584677 (ISHIKAWA KIMIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 12; figure 1 * |