EP1452148 - Bracket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heiser, Wolfgang Dr.-Stumpf-Strasse 73 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Heiser, Wolfgang, Dr. med. Dr.-Stumpf-Strasse 73 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher - Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher - Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Körner, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kroher * Strobel, Rechts- und Patentanwälte, Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003493.6 | 17.02.2004 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | DE2003108795 | 27.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10308795 | DE2003124088 | 27.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10324088 | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1452148 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1452148 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1452148 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/28 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
A61C7/30 (EP,US);
A61C7/28 (EP,US);
A61C7/287 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/07] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bracket | [2004/36] | English: | Bracket | [2004/36] | French: | Bracket | [2004/36] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 07.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4144642 (WALLSHEIN MELVIN) [AD] 1 * column 4, lines 13-53; figures 6,7,15 * * column 6, lines 40-61 *; | [A]US5685711 (HANSON G HERBERT [CA]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 28 - column 7, line 38; figures 4-10 *; | [AP]EP1287789 (TOMY INC [JP]) [AP] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US4144642 | US4492573 | US5562444 |