EP1449615 - Numerical control unit for detection of abnormal load on an electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michiya Inoue 2-39-11, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0023 / JP | 02 /
Hajime Ishii c/o FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2005/04] |
Former [2004/49] | 01 /
Michiya, Inoue 2-39-11, Kumboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0023 / JP | ||
02 /
Hajime, Ishii c/o FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | |||
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
Michiya, Inoue 2-39-11, Kumboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0023 / JP | ||
02 /
Hajime, Ishii Room 105, Sankopo Aoi, 6-8-26 Tamadaira Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0053 / JP | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003552.9 | 17.02.2004 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | JP20030044200 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003044200 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449615 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449615 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q17/09, G05B19/4065 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
B23Q17/0961 (EP);
B23Q17/09 (US);
G05B19/4065 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/20] |
Former [2004/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NC-Einheit zur Überwachung der Beanspruchung auf einem Elektroantrieb | [2004/35] | English: | Numerical control unit for detection of abnormal load on an electric motor | [2004/35] | French: | Unité de contrôle numérique pour la détection d'une charge anormale sur un moteur électrique | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 14.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5857166 (KIM NAM H [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]EP1166960 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [PA]EP1342534 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-7* abstract * |