EP1422378 - Gerotor compressor and gerotor expander [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM 310 Wisenbaker College Station, TX 77843-3122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states THE TEXAS A & M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM 310 Wisenbaker College Station, TX 77843-3122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holtzapple, Mark T. 1805 Southwood Drive College Station Texas 77840 / US | 02 /
Rabroker, Andrew G. 8713 Sandstone College Station, TX 77843 / US | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/22] | 01 /
Holtzapple, Mark T. 1805 Southwood Drive College Station Texas 77840 / US | ||
02 /
Rabroker, Andrew G. 213 Bucknell College Station Texas 77840 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/22] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003555.2 | 30.07.1999 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | US19980094920P | 31.07.1998 Original published format: US 94920 P | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422378 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422378 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01C11/00, F01C21/10, F01C1/10, F01C21/00 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
F02G1/02 (EP);
F01C1/103 (EP);
F01C11/004 (EP);
F02G2250/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/22] | Title | German: | Gerotorverdichter und Gerotorexpansionsvorrichtung | [2004/22] | English: | Gerotor compressor and gerotor expander | [2004/22] | French: | Compresseur et expandeur du type Gerotor | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 08.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02022310.3 / EP1270899 | EP99937633.8 / EP1101024 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.2005 | CH | 21.09.2005 | CY | 21.09.2005 | FI | 21.09.2005 | LI | 21.09.2005 | DK | 21.12.2005 | GR | 21.12.2005 | PT | 21.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/34] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | CH | 21.09.2005 | |
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 21.09.2005 | |
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 21.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3334253 (HILL FRANCIS A) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-20 ** column 2, line 36 - line 72 *; | [A]US3894255 (NEWTON JR GEORGE C) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-10 * * abstract * * column 6, line 1 - line 56 *; | [A]US4052928 (PIERRAT MICHEL A, et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-7 * * abstract * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]FR2720788 (DEL BARBA WILLY [FR]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 * * figure a * * claims 1-4 * |