EP1465372 - Providing link quality intelligence from physical layer to higher protocol layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine, California 92618-7013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karaoguz, Jeyhan 15 Petria California 92606 Irvine / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | Jehle, Volker Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04003649.3 | 18.02.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | US20030460350P | 03.04.2003 Original published format: US 460350 P | US20030472336P | 21.05.2003 Original published format: US 472336 P | US20030473776P | 28.05.2003 Original published format: US 473776 P | US20030475661P | 04.06.2003 Original published format: US 475661 P | US20030668653 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: US 668653 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465372 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1465372 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1465372 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/18, // H04W84/18, H04W88/06 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | H04L12/56, H04L12/28, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/52] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bereitstellung der Verbindungsqualitätsintelligenz aus physikalischer Schicht zu höheren Protokollschichten | [2004/41] | English: | Providing link quality intelligence from physical layer to higher protocol layers | [2004/41] | French: | Fourniture d'intelligence de qualité des liaisons de la couche physique à couches de protocole supérieures | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 17.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9926430 (ENSEMBLE COMM INC [US]) [A] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5991627 (HONKASALO ZHI-CHUN [US], et al) [A] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP1146691 (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS [IT]) [X] 1,4,8,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * claim 1 * [A] 2,5,6,9; | [XA]US2002027894 (ARRAKOSKI JORI [FI], et al) [X] 1,4,8,10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0171] * * claims 1,5 * [A] 2,5,6,9; | [XAY]US2002054578 (ZHANG QIAN [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0128] * [A] 6,7 [Y] 5; | [A]US2002115413 (SAARINEN MATTI [FI], et al) [A] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO02087096 (RADIONOR COMM AS [NO], et al) [X] 1,4,8,10 * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 20 * * page 4, line 5 - line 17 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 16 * [A] 2,5,6,9; | [A]US2003054811 (HAN JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 6,7* the whole document *; | [XAY] - JENNIFER BRAY, CHARLES F STURMAN, Bluetooth - Connect Without Cables, UPPER SADDLE RIVER, NJ, PRENTICE-HALL, INC, (2001), XP002471968 [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 41 - page 45 * * page 332 - page 350 * [A] 6,7 [Y] 5 |